Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Scott, Michael J., against Strahm, Doug G, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Griffin, Bret presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 01, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal w/o Prejudice |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Strahm NS Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit as to Doug G. Strahm |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Strahm NSO Proposed Order (unsigned) Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice- Notice of Nonsuit. |
|
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss - Cap1 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue |
|
July 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Citation and Return | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 Citation @ $8.00 Along With S/C Sheet And Placed up Front for Process Server EZ Messenger, Mailed S/C Sheet To Attorney. RK |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Original Petition - OCA | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | OCA Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.