Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
City Of League City, Galveston County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, against Equity Trust Company, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 30, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA | |
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Correspondence W. Ross Klingberg |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Citation and Return | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Original Petition - OCA | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | OCA Case Information Sheet | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Attorney 1 citation issued @ $8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.