Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bonner, Alexis Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bonner, Matthew Austin, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 306th District Court with Darring, Anne B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House306th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 31, 2013Correspondence
Date: January 02, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 26, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Setting (Hearing) Set #1 (3 days) |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Wage Withholding Order NO RFI |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Child Support Set up Sheet 03/02/2015 SDU BF |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials Counter-Petitioner appeared and testified. Decree, wage order and medical support order signed. abd |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Divorce Decree - Agreed - OCA | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Medical Child-Support Order | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Entry Hearing | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Wage Withholding Order Proposed Order (unsigned) Original Income Withholding Order/Notice for Support (IWO) s/306th /SR |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Final Decree of Divorce s/306th /SR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.