Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cagle, Gerald Wain, Jr., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cagle, Claudia D., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 306th District Court with Darring, Anne B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House306th District Court |
Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 07, 2015Motion to Modify - Reopen - OCA
Date: April 13, 2015Request for Copies
Date: November 24, 2015Counter Petition
Date: January 21, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: December 30, 2013Request for Copies
Date: August 21, 2014Motion
Date: July 15, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order - Post Judgment Family Motion - Final - OCA Order in Suit for Modification of Support Order and to Confirm Support Arrearage |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | AG Hearing Notice - Precept Issuance - Work Product $8 | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | AG Citation - Issuance - Work Product $8 | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
REDM Enforcement - Confirm CS Arrears & Mod $15 REDM |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
OCA Case Information Sheet CCIS |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
0603E_GALVESTON_0013232567_18 Notice of Attorney General as Necessary Party |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies 10/16/17 completed- SD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.