Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Soto, Brittany N., filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Soto, David Esqueda, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 3 with Ewing, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryAll Other Family - Protective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 3 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Protective Order - Fax Verification Sheet and Return | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Protective Order - Fax Verification Sheet | |
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Protective Order Granted - Final - OCA | |
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials Application for Protective Order is granted per agreed order filed.\SWB |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Waiver of Right to Request De Novo Hearing | |
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Ex parte |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order and Return | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice - From Court of Setting Date | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order - OCA - New Case | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order - Issued - Work Product Iss i/c p/o s/o PS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.