Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Williams, Darrell W., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by De La Garza, Bill, against Williams, Marlee Jaan, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 306th District Court with Yarbrough, Janis L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House306th District Court |
Request for Copies
Date: October 06, 2014Counter Petition
Date: January 07, 2014Amended Counter Claim
Date: April 02, 2014Request for Copies
Date: October 06, 2014Amended Petition
Date: June 02, 2014Motion to Substitute Counsel
Date: May 22, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 22, 2014Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 27, 2013Original Answer
Date: January 07, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
15893-001 notice of delivery notice of delivery |
|
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies of Documents.Decree Request for Copies of Documents (Decree)s/cust service /SR |
|
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies of Documents.QDRO Request for Copies of Documents (QDRO)s/cust service /SR |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order (QUDRO) Valero Energy Corporation Pension Plan |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
QDRO.Valero Pension.SIGNED Proposed Order (unsigned) Qualified Domestic Relations Order-Valero Energy Corporation Pension Plan |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Final Divorce Decree - Agreed - OCA | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Entry Hearing | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Deadline to Complete Matter | |
September 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Decree of Divorce.9.01.14 Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Final Decree of Divorce; s/306th; pks |
|
September 01, 2014 | Docket Event | BVS FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.