Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Franklin, James Arthur, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Franklin, Lorela Delos Santos, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 306th District Court with Darring, Anne B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House306th District Court |
Financial Information Statement
Date: March 16, 2020Wage Withholding Order
Date: May 02, 2014Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 26, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service AMENDED |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Report David Torok- AD |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service - Citation Affidavit of Service Citation |
|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product -hw |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Service iss 1 cit m to atty -hw |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Financial Information Statement emailed to Attorney |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Sheet emailed to Attorney |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify - Custody - Reopen - OCA Parent-Child Relationship with Request for Relief for Temporary Orders, and/or Injunct Relief |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address jb |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Green Card Returned/Delivered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.