Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Haley, Sonia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Quinonez, Araceli, represented by Yborra, Mark E., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Griffin, Bret presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Original Answer
Date: January 03, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dismiss - Want of Prosecution cannot get Pro Se Pltf to respond to phone call |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date Dismissal Docket |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Check Status left msg for pro se pltf to call |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Phillip Roberts |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
QUINONEZ _ ANSWER_201312300942 Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
QUINONEZ _ ORDER APPT GAL Proposed Order (unsigned) Order to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.