Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Venegas, Regina, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hammock, R. Talmadge, against Venegas Iii, Leo Martin, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 31, 2013Request for Civil Service
Date: December 31, 2013Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 08, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Status Conference If case not dismissed, call Judith Updegraff at Hammock Law Firm 281-667-4128 to check status. |
|
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
2014-09-08 PDF Order Granting Nonsuit Proposed Order (unsigned) Notice of Nonsuit |
|
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
2014-09-08 PDF Notice of Nonsuit Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA Notice of Nonsuit |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Attorney | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Re: Issued 1 citation @ $ 8.00 called attorney for pick up hold for civil Process Server mailed s/c to attorney |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
2013-12-30 PDF Original Petition Original Petition - OCA (1-10 plantiffs) |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
2013-12-30 PDF Request for Citation Request for Civil Service; to AV. |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
2013-12-30 PDF Civil Case Info Sheet OCA Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.