Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ben-Amran, Yoram, Galtex Development, Llc, Murphy, Joe, filed a(n) Other Civil - Cases case represented by Stevens, Mark W, against The City Of Galveston, represented by Holland, Jocelyn A., Salyer, David P, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2012 |
CategoryOther Civil - Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Order
Date: December 09, 2019Appeal - Mandate Affirming
Date: December 02, 2019Notice of Appeal
Date: March 12, 2014Notice of Appearance
Date: March 12, 2014Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: November 19, 2019Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: September 03, 2019Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: September 13, 2019Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: July 30, 2019Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: November 28, 2018Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: July 02, 2019Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: July 02, 2019Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: October 22, 2018Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: June 14, 2019Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: October 22, 2018Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: December 28, 2018Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: November 28, 2018Appeal - Judgment from Court of Appeals
Date: June 05, 2018Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: June 05, 2018Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: February 11, 2017Appeal - Opinion
Date: June 05, 2018Request for Clerk Record on Appeal
Date: February 01, 2017Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: January 25, 2017Appeal - Assignment Letter to the Court of Appeals
Date: January 12, 2017Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 29, 2016Objection
Date: September 29, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 27, 2016Response
Date: September 27, 2016Attorney Vacation Letter
Date: August 31, 2016Attorney Vacation Letter
Date: August 31, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 22, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 09, 2016Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: June 09, 2016Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: November 20, 2015Appeal - Bill of Cost from Court of Appeal
Date: January 08, 2016Appeal - Mandate - Affirming in Part -Reversing - Part
Date: January 08, 2016Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: January 08, 2016Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: August 07, 2015Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: June 05, 2015Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: June 25, 2015Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: June 05, 2015Appeal - Judgment from Court of Appeals
Date: January 13, 2015Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: January 13, 2015Appeal - Opinion
Date: January 13, 2015Remit Letter for Costs - File Copy
Date: March 24, 2014Appeal - Assignment Letter to the Court of Appeals
Date: March 17, 2014Copy of Order
Date: October 01, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Destruction Clerk certificate of destruction of exhibits filed and known defined as State Library record series DC2025-03c. |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order accknowledging mandate entry |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER OF MANDATE SIGNED KLN/law. |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Appeal - Mandate Affirming | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal notice Supreme Court Denied Motion for Rehearing Petition for Review |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Check Status OF APPEAL. |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal Post card Notice informing parties of Extension of Time to file a response |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal COPY OF CORRESPONDENCE SENT TO APPEAL PARTIES |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal Re: Motion for Rehearing - Post Card. |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal Re: Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing (14-17-00063-CV)- Post Card. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.