Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Francis, Elton Deray, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Francis, Regina Y, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 3 with Dupuy, Christopher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2010 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 3 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Inmate Correspondence from Pro Se Party |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable Notice |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Court | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Check Status | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Inmate Correspondence from Pro Se Party |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Inmate Correspondence from Pro Se Party |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Original Petition - OCA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.