Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hiles, Phillip L., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hiles, Laura A., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 306th District Court with Yarbrough, Janis L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2010 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House306th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Divorce Decree - Agreed - OCA /s/Frank Carmona |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Attorney | |
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Status Conference Sheet | |
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Original Petition - OCA | |
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Attorney | |
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event | OCA Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.