Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Romig, Barbara Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Romig, Kris Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 306th District Court with Yarbrough, Janis L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2010 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House306th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Final Setting (Hearing) Settled per Rule 11. dh |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Settled per Rule 11. dh |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Deadline to Complete Matter | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Final Divorce Decree - Agreed - OCA 4/29/11 M BVS & CC OF DECREE TO RESP M CD |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Final Setting (Hearing) Settled per Rule 11. dh |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Settled per Rule 11. dh |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Seen By Court |
|
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.