Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Petrowski, Chris, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Toups, Mitchell A., against American Security Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2010 |
CategoryContract - Debt - Commercial/Consumer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Removed to Federal Court. |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Order of Removal to Federal Court - OCA | |
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Removal Supplemental |
|
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal | |
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Attorney | |
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation by Certified Mail and Return | |
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 O/C Cit. M to Atty.; S/C M to Atty. mm |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note - Work Product | |
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Standing Ike Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.