Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bunting, W. Ken, Iii, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by West, Michael D., against Maxwell, Darold, represented by Beeton, Timothy A, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Criss, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2010 |
CategoryContract - Debt - Commercial/Consumer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA Take Nothing Jdmt. |
|
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Attorney s/crt with proposed Agreed Jdmt |
|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
October 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference per Melanie 713/222-9378 |
|
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non Suit - Partial Voluntary Non-Suit of Intervention Claim |
|
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Attorney | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Oral Hearing set 10-3-11 @ 11:15 a.m. |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.