Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Golf Stream Owners' Association, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mostyn, J. Steve, against Owens, Skip, Keene, Terris, Robbins, Kenneth, Frank, Ralph, Dickerson, Jerry, (total of 13) See All represented by Haley, Jim, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 405th District Court with Mallia, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2010 |
CategoryContract - Debt - Commercial/Consumer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House405th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes AGRD FNL JUDGMT SIGNED WJM |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Attorney Sent to CRT w/Agreed Final Jdmt. |
|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation Issuance - Work Product | |
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Service | |
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.