Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mitchell, Terry L., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mastin, John, against Bms Catastrophe, Inc. A K A Bms Cat., Inc., New, Christina M., represented by Williamson, Kent D., Levin, Neil, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Criss, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2010 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Attorney Vacation Letter | |
November 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Check Status | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Interlocutory Judgment Intervenor's Claims against Christina New |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA | |
October 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Attorney s/crt with order of dismissal |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Attorney s/crt with proposed Interlocutory Jdmt |
|
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.