Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chapman, Charles, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mostyn, J. Steve, against Fielder, Donald, Nutter, Ashley, Gilbert, Keith, Catastrophe Specialist, Inc., Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, (total of 5) See All represented by Sanders, Wayne E., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Criss, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2010 |
CategoryContract - Debt - Commercial/Consumer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA | |
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Attorney Sent to CRT w/Proposed Agreed Final Judgment. |
|
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 4 Cits. Mailed to Atty. sd |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Service Letter request to Issue 4 Cits. @ 32.00 |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition First |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
February 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Docket Control Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.