Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Keiser, Philip filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2010 |
CategoryContract - Debt - Commercial/Consumer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Order
Date: January 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Regarding Hurricane Ike Litigation (All Pre- Trial Matters Assigned to 56th District Court for Handling, and Cases will be tried in the Original Court where filed) | |
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Non-Final take nothing judgment as to Pltfs and TWIA only |
|
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Take Nothing Jdmt.; to 10th CRT. |
|
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Check Status | |
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail - Return Receipt Requested Article Green card signed on 12-20-12 |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Certified Mail - Return Receipt Requested Article | |
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Green Card Returned/Delivered Receipt for registry funds |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Release Funds (duplicate order-original filed 12-14-12) |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes order to dispense funds signed by Judge Criss |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.