Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Norris, Henriette, Norris, Edward, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mostyn, J. Steve, against Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, represented by Holbrook, J. Mark, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2010 |
CategoryContract - Debt - Commercial/Consumer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Agreed Final Judgment 10/5/11. |
|
October 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA | |
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Attorney Sent to CRT w/Proposed Agreed Final Judgment. |
|
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Docket Control Order | |
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
September 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
September 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.