Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Conaway, Charles Herbert, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Conaway, Martha Letecia, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 306th District Court with Yarbrough, Janis L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House306th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Transfer letter recieved by County |
|
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Green Card Returned/Delivered Beverly Kaufman, Harris County Probate Court received Transfer s/ verification |
|
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate | |
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
September 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Remit Letter for Costs - File Copy | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Copy of Order from Harris County | |
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Review File case was transferred to Harris County due to probate/guardianship |
|
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
September 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Final - Order Transfer Venue - OCA Harris County, Texas |
|
September 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Receipt of Documents (Transfer) fax confirmation sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.