Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ellis, Sharon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ellis, Thomas Ralf, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 2 with Roberts, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order (QUDRO) | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes QDRO signed/BER |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (unsigned) QUDRO |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter Order QUDRO |
|
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order (QUDRO) | |
March 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies s ver |
|
March 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (unsigned) qualified domestic relations order s/cc2 |
|
September 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Per David Salinsky - MSA Reached! WILL PROVE UP |
|
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Final Divorce Decree - Agreed - OCA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.