Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Galveston, County Of,, Galveston, City Of,, Galveston Independent School District,, Galveston College,, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark, against Centex Homes, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2008 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Order ORDER OF DISMISSAL/S/LC 1PG |
|
April 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Service Returned CITATION ON CENTEX HOMES SSERVED 4.01.09 |
|
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Documents PLTFS GALVESTON COUTNY ET AL 1ST AMD PETITION FILED BY ATY MARK CIAVAGLIA 4PGS |
|
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Service Returned CITATION ON CENTEX HOMES RETURNED UNEXECUTED |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - OCA ORIGINAL PETITION 4PGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.