Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marcantel, Dawn Lanay, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gleaton, Michael Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 3 with Dupuy, Christopher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship - No Divorce (Sapcr) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 3 |
Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 08, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order - Final - Default - OCA Default Order Confirming Support Arrearage |
|
October 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address | |
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation and Return | |
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Precept and Return | |
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event | AG Precept - Issuance - Work Product $8 | |
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event | AG Citation - Issuance - Work Product $8 | |
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (unsigned) Order Setting Hearing s/ cc3 HP |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | OCA Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.