Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Landry'S Restaurants, Inc.,, Willie G'S Post Oak, Inc.,, filed a(n) Other Civil - Cases case represented by Ware, James L., against Evergreen General Agency, Inc., Flagship Hospitality, Inc.,, Flagship Hotel, Ltd., The,, represented by Anderson, Rick, Johnson, Christopher L., Johnson, Millard A., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 405th District Court with Slaughter, Michelle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryOther Civil - Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Filing Court House405th District Court |
Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 15, 2013Memorandum
Date: January 10, 2014Motion for Entry of Judgment
Date: September 13, 2013Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 11, 2013Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 13, 2013Response to Motion
Date: November 15, 2013Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 14, 2014Correspondence
Date: July 15, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 14, 2014Motion
Date: March 23, 2015Response
Date: January 10, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 04, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 14, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 10, 2014Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 23, 2015Motion
Date: March 23, 2015Motion
Date: March 26, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 20, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 23, 2015Amended Petition
Date: March 27, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 26, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 23, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 18, 2014Motion
Date: March 20, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 17, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 09, 2015Motion for Continuance
Date: April 06, 2015Rule 11 Agreement
Date: March 27, 2015Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 24, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 23, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 20, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 24, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 06, 2015Motion
Date: March 23, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 23, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 01, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 30, 2015Motion
Date: April 15, 2014Motion for Continuance
Date: April 06, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 06, 2015Motion
Date: September 03, 2015Response
Date: September 28, 2015Motion to Strike
Date: September 02, 2015Motion
Date: June 04, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 01, 2015Reply
Date: January 17, 2014Correspondence
Date: September 09, 2015Reply
Date: January 17, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 01, 2015Motion
Date: September 01, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 07, 2015Motion for Continuance
Date: April 07, 2015Response
Date: June 30, 2015Motion to Strike
Date: September 03, 2015Motion for New Trial
Date: June 04, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 03, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 03, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 02, 2015Response
Date: April 17, 2014Correspondence
Date: January 22, 2014Response
Date: October 02, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 30, 2015Response
Date: July 02, 2015Correspondence
Date: February 03, 2014Correspondence
Date: February 10, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 30, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 02, 2015Response
Date: October 02, 2015Response
Date: October 02, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 02, 2015Objection
Date: July 06, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 02, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 02, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 04, 2014Motion
Date: April 15, 2014Response
Date: October 02, 2015Correspondence
Date: January 13, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 19, 2015Reply
Date: April 21, 2014Response
Date: January 17, 2014Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: October 27, 2015Correspondence
Date: January 17, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 30, 2015Supplement
Date: October 30, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 30, 2015Amended Answer
Date: July 31, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 27, 2015Motion to Strike
Date: September 02, 2015Response
Date: October 02, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 02, 2015Answer
Date: August 04, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 02, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 22, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 29, 2015Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 13, 2015Motion for Leave
Date: October 29, 2015Response
Date: June 30, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 30, 2015Reply
Date: July 28, 2015Amended Petition
Date: July 30, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 30, 2015Answer
Date: July 31, 2015Response
Date: October 02, 2015Response
Date: October 02, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 13, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 02, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 02, 2015Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 30, 2015Amended Motion
Date: October 27, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 02, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 30, 2015Notice of Filing
Date: October 30, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 30, 2015Amended Order
Date: July 22, 2013Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 17, 2014Response to Motion
Date: November 15, 2013Response to Motion
Date: November 08, 2013Objection to Motion
Date: November 08, 2013Brief in Support of
Date: July 14, 2014Order Denying Summary Judgment
Date: August 11, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Check Status case announced settled...awaiting final paperwork |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal; to CRT. Motion to Dismiss |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Joint Stipulation of Dismissal; to CRT. Proposed Order (unsigned) |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA | |
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Order of Dismissal signed |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal - Non Final as to Third Party Deft Evergreen |
|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Evergreen Insurance General Agency, Inc |
|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Flagships Mtn for Reconsideration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.