Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Leask, James, Sears, Laurie, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Mclean, Mark A, against Noble Services, L.L.C.,, Wright, Danny, Fogarty, Kevin, Wilkerson, John, represented by Kyle, Felicia Harris, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Garner, David E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarner, David E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Documents IMAGE BEGINS 2180.11.0 ENDS 2180.11.93 |
|
June 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Order AGREED J/M FOR DISMISSAL /S/ SPB 2PGS 2180.11.90 |
|
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Documents PLTF'S JAMES LEASK, ET UX 1ST AMND PETITION FILED BY ATY MARK MCLEAN 5PGS |
|
May 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Order DOCKET CONTROL ORDER /S/ DEG 1PG 2180.11.76 |
|
May 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Returned CITATION ON KEVIN FOGARTY RETURNED UNEXECUTED |
|
February 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Documents DEF NOBLE SERVICES, LLC, ECT ORIGINAL ANSWER AND ORIGINAL COUNTER CLAIM FILED BY ATY FELICIA HARRIS KYLE 24PGS |
|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Returned CITATION ON JOHN WILKERSON SERVED 1-23-07 |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Returned CITATION ON NOBLE SERVICES LLC SERVED 1-16-07 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.