Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
22101 Grand Corner Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Hall, Priscilla, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2023 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Citation Return - CivilServe
Date: August 11, 2023Citation
Date: August 07, 2023Case Filed (open event)
Date: August 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing CANCELED Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Crow, Kelly N.) Case Disposed |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Crow, Kelly N.) | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Odyssey Return to Court Citation Return - CivilServe |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation Rule 510.4(c) | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Eviction Citation ServiceHall, Priscilla Returned Unserved 08/10/2023Returned08/10/2023 | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Filed (open event) | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Eviction Citation ServiceHall, Priscilla Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.