Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Relan, Kathy L, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Erick Delarue, against Cornerstone Home Lending, A Division Of Cornerstone Capital Bank Ssb, represented by Bradley Conway, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
|
This complaint is a legal document filed by Kathy L. Relan against Cornerstone Home Lending, a Division of Cornerstone Capital Bank SSB. The document includes an Original Petition, Application for Injunctive Relief, and Request for disclosures. Kathy...
Request Index # 3
Date: December 28, 2023Petition Index # 1
Date: December 28, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6
Date: February 22, 2024Officers Return Index # 5
Date: February 01, 2024Issuance Index # 4
Date: December 29, 2023Temporary Restraining Order Index # 2
Date: December 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6Original Answer |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Return for Cornerstne Home Lending Served on 01/26/2024 Officers Return Index # 5 Officers Return Index # 5Citation Return for Cornerstne Home Lending, A Division of Cornerstonr Capital Bank SSB Served on 01/26/2024 |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Temporary Injunction Hearing CANCELED Temporary Injunction Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Williams, O'Neil) Passed |
|
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Cornerstone Home Lending, A Division of Cornerstone Capital Bank SSB Issuance Index # 4 Issuance Index # 4Citation Issued to Cornerstne Home Lending, A Division of Cornerstonr Capital Bank SSB |
|
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | CitationeServedCornerstone Home Lending, A Division of Cornerstone Capital Bank SSBServed01/26/2024Returned02/01/2024 | |
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Process Request Form Request Index # 3 Request Index # 3Civil Process Request Form |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition, Application for Injunctive Relief, and Request for Disclosures Petition Index # 1 Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition, Application for Injunctive Relief, and Request for Disclosures |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Index # 2 Temporary Restraining Order Index # 2Temporary Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.