Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Schramm, Austin Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Georgia Barker, against Schramm, Alexandra Garcia, represented by Yvette Deleon, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with LaTosha McGill Clayton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaTosha McGill Clayton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
This complaint is an original petition for divorce filed by Austin Michael Schramm against Alexandra Garcia Schramm in the Fort Bend County 505th Judicial District Court in Texas. The petition outlines the grounds for divorce, stating that the marria...
Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 11
Date: February 01, 2024Officers Return Index # 8
Date: January 25, 2024Issuance Index # 5
Date: January 02, 2024Amended Filing Index # 16
Date: February 12, 2024Counter Claim/Cross Action/Intervention/Third Party - Family Index # 10
Date: February 01, 2024Amended Filing Index # 17
Date: February 12, 2024Petition Index # 1
Date: December 27, 2023Proposed Order Index # 15
Date: February 12, 2024Order Index # 2
Date: December 27, 2023Proposed Order Index # 12
Date: February 01, 2024Proposed Order Index # 13
Date: February 01, 2024Request Index # 4
Date: December 29, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 14
Date: February 01, 2024Notice Index # 20
Date: February 22, 2024Notice Index # 18
Date: February 13, 2024Officers Return Index # 9
Date: January 25, 2024Issuance Index # 6
Date: January 02, 2024Order Index # 3
Date: December 29, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 7
Date: January 23, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing CANCELED Temporary Orders Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clayton, LaTosha McGill) Passed |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clayton, LaTosha McGill) | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation Agreement Notice Index # 20 Notice Index # 20Notice of Mediation Agreement |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Binding Mediated Settlement Agreement No Fee Documents Index # 19 No Fee Documents Index # 19Binding Mediated Settlement Agreement |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders Notice Index # 18 Notice Index # 18Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing CANCELED Temporary Orders Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clayton, LaTosha McGill) Passed |
|
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Order to Appear Amended Filing Index # 16 Amended Filing Index # 16Amended Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Order to Appear |
|
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
First Amended Counterpetition for Divorce Amended Filing Index # 17 Amended Filing Index # 17First Amended Counterpetition for Divorce |
|
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Amended Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Orders Proposed Order Index # 15 Proposed Order Index # 15Amended Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Orders |
|
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryThe Court reviewed an Amended TRO and Order setting hearing. Order setting hearing is blank. No request for extraordinary relief. Standing Mutual Injunctions in place. An updated proposed notice may be filed for the court's review and signature. lmc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.