Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
De La Haya, Monica Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Kourtney Parker, against Moffitt, John David, Jr, represented by Richard J. Tholstrup, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6
Date: July 31, 2023Counter Claim/Cross Action/Intervention/Third Party - Family Index # 7
Date: July 31, 2023Issuance Index # 4
Date: July 17, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 8
Date: September 20, 2023Officers Return Index # 5
Date: July 26, 2023Request Index # 3
Date: July 13, 2023Order Index # 2
Date: July 11, 2023Petition Index # 1
Date: July 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Initial Disclosure and Expert Disclosure No Fee Documents Index # 8 No Fee Documents Index # 8Respondent's Initial Disclosure and Expert Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 194 and Rule 195 of the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6Respondent's Original Answer |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Counter-Petition for Divorce Counter Claim/Cross Action/Intervention/Third Party - Family Index # 7 Counter Claim/Cross Action/Intervention/Third Party - Family Index # 7Counter-Petition for Divorce |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Officers Return Index # 5 Officers Return Index # 5Citation return for John David Moffitt. Issued on 7/17/2023 |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued to John David Moffitt Issuance Index # 4 Issuance Index # 4Citation Issued to John David Moffitt |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CitationeServiceMoffitt, John DavidServed07/19/2023Returned07/24/2023 | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Process Request Index # 3 Request Index # 3Request for Process |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 2 Order Index # 2Standing Temporary Mutual Injunctions Divorce with Children |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Petition for Divorce Petition Index # 1 Petition Index # 1Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.