Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Knese, Fionuala M., filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Michael P Von Blon, against Wyse, Michael Kenneth, represented by Jeremy B Ducote, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
|
No Fee Documents Index # 7
Date: August 17, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 9
Date: August 31, 2023Notice Index # 8
Date: August 17, 2023Notice Index # 5
Date: July 07, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 10
Date: August 31, 2023Proposed Order Index # 4
Date: July 06, 2023Notice Index # 6
Date: July 18, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 3
Date: July 06, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 2
Date: March 06, 2023Petition Index # 1
Date: February 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | M/Compel (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Pattel, Surendran K.) Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Request for Sanctions08/17/2023Reset by Court to 09/01/2023 | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Attorney Issued Subpoena Duces Tecum Not Prepared by DC No Fee Documents Index # 9 No Fee Documents Index # 9Attorney Issued Subpoena Duces Tecum Not Prepared by DC |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Attorney Issued Subpoena Duces Tecum Not Prepared by DC No Fee Documents Index # 10 No Fee Documents Index # 10Attorney Issued Subpoena Duces Tecum Not Prepared by DC |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Special Exceptions to Notice of Hearing No Fee Documents Index # 7 No Fee Documents Index # 7Defendant's Special Exceptions to Notice of Hearing |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Proceeding for Motion to Compel Discovery and Request for Sanctions Notice Index # 8 Notice Index # 8Notice of Court Proceeding for Motion to Compel Discovery and Request for Sanctions |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Counsel's Change of Address Notice Index # 6 Notice Index # 6Notice of Counsel's Change of Address |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice Index # 5 Notice Index # 5Notice of Hearing |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Request for Sanctions Proposed Order Index # 4 Proposed Order Index # 4Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Request for Sanctions |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Request for Sanctions Motion (No Fee) Index # 3 Motion (No Fee) Index # 3Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Request for Sanctions |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 2 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 2Defendant's Original Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.