Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Haven At Bellaire Ii Llc Dba Haven At Bellaire, filed a(n) Other Civil case against Dubose, Naquethia, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Tyra J. McCollum presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
|
Notice of Hearing
Date: September 15, 2023Exhibit
Date: September 15, 2023Notice
Date: September 15, 2023Request
Date: September 15, 2023Filing
Date: September 06, 2023Notice
Date: September 15, 2023Filing
Date: August 11, 2023Filing
Date: August 16, 2023Filing
Date: August 10, 2023Transcript - JP
Date: August 08, 2023Docket Sheet
Date: August 08, 2023Transcript - JP
Date: August 08, 2023Docket Sheet
Date: August 08, 2023Filing
Date: August 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | JP Eviction Appeal (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer McCollum, Tyra) | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Oral Hearing Notice of HearingNotice of Oral Hearing |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS ExhibitExhibits |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance and Supplement- Naquethia Dubose NoticeNotice of Appearance of Counsel and Supplement to Original Complaint of Forcible Detainer |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Trial Setting- Dubose, Naquethia RequestRequest for Trial Setting |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sworn Notice of Default NoticeSworn Notice of Default Pursuant |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Sworn Notice of Default Proposed OrderOrder on Sworn Notice of Default (stw 9/20/23 yb) |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FilingReturned Mail qc/cc | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | FilingGreen cards qc/yb/dl | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | FilingCMR slips qc/yb/dl |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.