Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Burrell, Josette, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Taylor, Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Dismissed for Want of Prosecution
Date: June 13, 2023Court Notice
Date: April 26, 2023Citation Return
Date: October 18, 2022Citation by Certified Mail
Date: September 20, 2022Original Petition
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed for Want of Prosecution | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Janssen, Gary D.) DWOP Result: Dismissed | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Court NoticeDWOP | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation ReturnCertified Citation returned unserved | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation by Certified Mail | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Original Petition | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Filed (open event) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.