Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Waterstone Place, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Chenault, Nina, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a response from the Department of Defense Manpower Data Center regarding the active duty status of an individual. The response states that the individual in question is not currently on active duty based on the active duty status da...
Affidavit
Date: October 11, 2022Request
Date: October 17, 2022Citation
Date: September 19, 2022Original Petition
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Appealed | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | PossessionCHENAULT, NINA Unserved | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Noticepaupers-mailed and emailed to defendant | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Remarkswrit on hold per judge-nonpayment of rent case waiting on deposit | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | PossessionCHENAULT, NINA Unserved | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT - CHENAULT RequestWOP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.