Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Amdt, Llc, Chow, Alice, Holloway, Mark, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Kevin Powers, against Mcintyre, Don, Nehls, Terry, represented by Frank Osborne Carroll, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Tameika Carter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
|
Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 15
Date: May 15, 2023Notice Index # 13
Date: March 22, 2023Amended Filing Index # 11
Date: March 03, 2023Certificate Index # 18
Date: May 16, 2023Transfer Out Index # 17
Date: May 15, 2023Notice Index # 8
Date: February 07, 2023Proposed Order Index # 16
Date: May 15, 2023Amended Filing Index # 14
Date: May 05, 2023Motion to Transfer/Change of Venue - Civil Index # 7
Date: January 30, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 12
Date: March 20, 2023Issuance Index # 5
Date: December 28, 2022Proposed Order Index # 10
Date: March 01, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 9
Date: March 01, 2023Officers Return Index # 6
Date: January 12, 2023Petition Index # 1
Date: December 20, 2022Issuance Index # 4
Date: December 28, 2022Request Index # 3
Date: December 20, 2022Request Index # 2
Date: December 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
* Letter - OCA Approved Transfer Certificate Certificate Index # 18 Certificate Index # 18Transfer Certificate |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Amended Motion to Transfer Venue Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 15 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 15Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Amended Motion to Transfer Venue |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Transfer Out Index # 17 Transfer Out Index # 17Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Venue Transfer Proposed Order Index # 16 Proposed Order Index # 16Order Denying Venue Transfer |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryCase called. After review of filings and argument of counsel, Defense Motion to Transfer is Granted. - TC | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | M/Transfer Venue (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Carter, Tameika) hearing reset from 4/24/23 to submit brief | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Amended Motion to Transfer Venue Amended Filing Index # 14 Amended Filing Index # 14Defendants' Amended Motion to Transfer Venue |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryTyped "TX" in error. - TC | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryAttorneys to Brief Interest of Justice issue. reset Hearing. - TX | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | M/Transfer Venue (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Carter, Tameika) Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.