Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Martinez, Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Andrew Dornburg, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2022 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Maria Martinez as the next friend of A.W., a minor, against Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company Inc. The plaintiffs reside in Richmond, Fort Bend County, Texas, and the defendant is a corporation that can be served thr...
No Fee Documents Index # 7
Date: March 22, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5
Date: November 07, 2022Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 11
Date: April 19, 2023Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 13
Date: April 19, 2023Affidavit Index # 8
Date: April 12, 2023Final Judgment After Non-Jury Trial Index # 10
Date: April 19, 2023Petition Index # 1
Date: October 11, 2022Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 12
Date: April 19, 2023Order Approving Payment Index # 9
Date: April 17, 2023Notice Index # 6
Date: March 06, 2023Order Appointing Index # 4
Date: October 12, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 3
Date: October 11, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 2
Date: October 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 11 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 11 |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 13 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 13 |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment for Minor Final Judgment After Non-Jury Trial Index # 10 Final Judgment After Non-Jury Trial Index # 10Agreed Final Judgment for Minor |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 12 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 12 |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Attorney's Fees Order Approving Payment Index # 9 Order Approving Payment Index # 9Order Approving Attorney's Fees |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Minor Settlement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Williams, O'Neil) Spanish interpreter requested for minor's parent, Maria Martinez | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support of Request for Attorney's Fees Affidavit Index # 8 Affidavit Index # 8Affidavit in Support of Request for Attorney's Fees |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
No Fee Documents Index # 7 No Fee Documents Index # 7Interpreting/Translating Services Request Form |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice Index # 6 Notice Index # 6Notice of Hearing |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Answer of the Guardian Ad Litem Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5Original Answer of the Guardian Ad Litem |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.