Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Garduno, Marisol, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jonathan C. Kieschnick, against Huang, Weiqiang, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2022 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Certificate Index # 9
Date: August 08, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 8
Date: June 07, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 7
Date: June 07, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 6
Date: April 18, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5
Date: March 17, 2023Officers Return Index # 4
Date: February 23, 2023Issuance Index # 3
Date: October 05, 2022Request Index # 2
Date: October 03, 2022Petition Index # 1
Date: October 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification Deposition of Marisol Garduno July 12, 2023 ($643.50) Certificate Index # 9 Certificate Index # 9Reporter's Certification Deposition of Marisol Garduno July 12, 2023 ($643.50) |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant Weiqiang Huang's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories No Fee Documents Index # 8 No Fee Documents Index # 8Defendant Weiqiang Huang's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant Weiqiang Huang's Responses to Plaintiffs Request for Production Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 7 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 7Defendant Weiqiang Huang's Responses to Plaintiffs Request for Production |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement No Fee Documents Index # 6 No Fee Documents Index # 6Rule 11 Agreement |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant Weiqiang Huang's Original Answer Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5Defendant Weiqiang Huang's Original Answer |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Return for Weiqiang Huang Served 02/21/23 Officers Return Index # 4 Officers Return Index # 4Citation Return for Weiqiang Huang Served 02/21/23 |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation - Weiqiang Huang Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Weiqiang Huang |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CitationeServedHuang, WeiqiangServed02/21/2023Returned02/23/2023 | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CitationeServedHuang, Weiqiang Unserved | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Process Request Index # 2 Request Index # 2Request for Process |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.