Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
**Confidential** filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Shamblen, Laura, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Kali R. Morgan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2022 |
CategoryProtective Orders - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Proposed Order Index # 4
Date: August 04, 2022Notice Index # 3
Date: August 04, 2022Proposed Order Index # 2
Date: July 28, 2022Application for Protective Order Index # 1
Date: July 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing CANCELED Protective Order Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Morgan, Kali) Passed Judge: Morgan, Kali |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Morgan, Kali)
Judge: Morgan, Kali |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryThe Court reveiwed a proposed Order of Non-Suit. A separate motion to withdraw will need to be filed. An updated Order of Non-suit may be submitted without the language regarding withdrawal of counsel. lmc | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Non-Suit Proposed Order Index # 4 Proposed Order Index # 4Order of Non-Suit |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Andrew Shamblen's Notice of Non-Suit Notice Index # 3 Notice Index # 3Andrew Shamblen's Notice of Non-Suit |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryNotice of Hearing signed -klm | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order Proposed Order Index # 2 Proposed Order Index # 2Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order and Order Setting Hearing |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Andrew Shamblen's Application for Protective Order Application for Protective Order Index # 1 Application for Protective Order Index # 1Andrew Shamblen's Application for Protective Order |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order Proposed Order Index # 2 Proposed Order Index # 2Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.