Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Vargas, Elisa Raquel, filed a(n) Licensing - Administrative case against State Of Texas, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2022 |
CategoryOccupational Drivers License |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeLicensing |
Filing
Date: September 19, 2022Copy Request
Date: February 24, 2023Petition
Date: July 28, 2022Final Judgment After Non-Jury Trial
Date: September 16, 2022Proposed Order
Date: July 28, 2022Filing
Date: July 28, 2022Affidavit/Statement of Inability to Afford Costs
Date: July 28, 2022Docket Sheet
Date: July 28, 2022Filing
Date: July 28, 2022Proposed Order
Date: July 28, 2022Petition
Date: July 28, 2022Affidavit/Statement of Inability to Afford Costs
Date: July 28, 2022Docket Sheet
Date: July 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Copy Requestqc/vt | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | FilingCertified Mail qc/cr/JH/mr/JH/cr/JH | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Judgment After Non-Jury TrialSigned on 09/16/2022 QC/PLL/JH | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer/Responseqc/cr/JH | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Occupational Drivers License (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer White, Lewis) | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Occupational Drivers License (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer White, Lewis) | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Petitionqc/vp/dl | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Orderqc/vp/dl | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | FilingSR 22 qc/vp/dl | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Statement of Inability to Afford Costsqc/vp/dl |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.