Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Tejas Avco, Inc., filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by John Mcdowell, against Cemex Construction Materials South, Llc, Poarch Swinbank Llc, represented by John Hatchett Mcfarland, Sabrina Anne Neff, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
|
Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 80
Date: July 18, 2023Proposed Order Index # 79
Date: July 17, 2023Notice Index # 78
Date: July 17, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 77
Date: July 17, 2023Amended Filing Index # 76
Date: July 10, 2023Notice Index # 75
Date: July 07, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 74
Date: July 07, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 72
Date: June 22, 2023Amended Filing Index # 71
Date: June 21, 2023Amended Filing Index # 70
Date: June 16, 2023Notice Index # 69
Date: June 08, 2023Notice Index # 68
Date: May 17, 2023Order Index # 64
Date: May 16, 2023Order Index # 63
Date: May 16, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 73
Date: July 07, 2023Notice Index # 67
Date: May 12, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 62
Date: April 20, 2023Notice Index # 66
Date: April 24, 2023Notice Index # 61
Date: February 17, 2023Notice Index # 65
Date: April 21, 2023Notice Index # 60
Date: February 14, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 57
Date: January 31, 2023Order Index # 52
Date: September 21, 2022Order Index # 58
Date: February 01, 2023Notice Index # 59
Date: February 06, 2023Proposed Order Index # 56
Date: January 12, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 55
Date: January 12, 2023Order Index # 54
Date: September 19, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 51
Date: September 12, 2022Proposed Order Index # 49
Date: September 12, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 53
Date: September 14, 2022Amended Filing Index # 50
Date: September 12, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 48
Date: September 12, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 46
Date: September 12, 2022Proposed Order Index # 44
Date: August 26, 2022Notice Index # 45
Date: August 26, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 43
Date: August 26, 2022Order Index # 42
Date: July 14, 2022Order Index # 39
Date: July 14, 2022Proposed Order Index # 47
Date: September 12, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 40
Date: July 07, 2022Proposed Order Index # 41
Date: July 07, 2022DWOP Notice Sent
Date: May 26, 2022Letters
Date: May 12, 2022Certificate Index # 37
Date: September 07, 2021Letters
Date: May 11, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 38
Date: July 01, 2022Notice Index # 36
Date: September 07, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 35
Date: September 07, 2021Order Index # 33
Date: September 07, 2021Order Index # 34
Date: September 07, 2021Petition Index # 31
Date: September 07, 2021Order Index # 32
Date: September 07, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 26
Date: September 07, 2021Notice Index # 29
Date: September 07, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 23
Date: September 07, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 30
Date: September 07, 2021Notice Index # 19
Date: September 07, 2021Amended Filing Index # 25
Date: September 07, 2021Notice Index # 27
Date: September 07, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 22
Date: September 07, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 28
Date: September 07, 2021Petition Index # 21
Date: September 07, 2021Notice Index # 20
Date: September 07, 2021Notice Index # 24
Date: September 07, 2021Notice Index # 18
Date: September 07, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 16
Date: September 07, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 15
Date: September 07, 2021Amended Filing Index # 17
Date: September 07, 2021Request Index # 10
Date: September 07, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 14
Date: September 07, 2021Issuance Index # 12
Date: September 07, 2021Proposed Order Index # 11
Date: September 07, 2021Petition Index # 9
Date: September 07, 2021Amended Filing Index # 7
Date: September 07, 2021Order Index # 8
Date: September 07, 2021Petition Index # 2
Date: September 07, 2021Issuance Index # 4
Date: September 07, 2021Officers Return Index # 13
Date: September 07, 2021Motion to Transfer/Change of Venue - Civil Index # 6
Date: September 07, 2021Request Index # 3
Date: September 07, 2021Officers Return Index # 5
Date: September 07, 2021Transfer In (open event) Index # 1
Date: September 07, 2021Letters
Date: September 09, 2021Docket Sheet
Date: September 07, 2021Letters
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant CEMEX's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for More Detailed Privilege Log Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 80 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 80Defendant CEMEX's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for More Detailed Privilege Log |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of an Adequate Privilege Log Proposed Order Index # 79 Proposed Order Index # 79Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of an Adequate Privilege Log |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Oral Hearing Notice Index # 78 Notice Index # 78Notice of Oral Hearing |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of an Adequate Privilege Log from Defendants Motion (No Fee) Index # 77 Motion (No Fee) Index # 77Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of an Adequate Privilege Log from Defendants |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant CEMEX Construction Materials South, LLC's Amended Answer as of July 2023 Amended Filing Index # 76 Amended Filing Index # 76Defendant CEMEX Construction Materials South, LLC's Amended Answer as of July 2023 |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Oral Hearing Notice Index # 75 Notice Index # 75Notice of Oral Hearing |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff Tejas AVCO, Inc's TRCP 193.4 Motion for Rulings on Defendant Cemex's Objections to Request Motion (No Fee) Index # 74 Motion (No Fee) Index # 74Plaintiff Tejas AVCO, Inc's TRCP 193.4 Motion for Rulings on Defendant Cemex's Objections to Request for Production |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff Tejas AVCO. Inc's TRCP 193.4 Motion for Rulings on Defendant P/S's Objections to Request Motion (No Fee) Index # 73 Motion (No Fee) Index # 73Plaintiff Tejas AVCO. Inc's TRCP 193.4 Motion for Rulings on Defendant P/S's Objections to Request for Production |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant CEMEX's Objections to Deposition Notice for Corporate Representative Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 72 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 72Defendant Cemex Construction Materials South, LLC's Objections to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition for Corporate Representative |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant CEMEX's Amended Answer as of June 21 2023 Amended Filing Index # 71 Amended Filing Index # 71Defendant CEMEX Construction Materials South, LLC's Amended Answer as of June 21, 2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.