Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cardona, Eber, Limas, Roberto, Majano, Allan, Mendoza, Ricardo, Perez, Roland, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Christopher J. Davila, Jesus Gerardo Davila, against Gonzalez, Yaniel Lopez, Ylg Transport Llc, represented by Kevin B. Tompkins, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 88
Date: April 28, 2023Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 86
Date: April 28, 2023Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 85
Date: April 28, 2023Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 87
Date: April 28, 2023Certificate Index # 81
Date: December 08, 2022Certificate Index # 82
Date: December 13, 2022Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 84
Date: April 28, 2023Certificate Index # 80
Date: November 07, 2022Final Judgment After Non-Jury Trial Index # 83
Date: April 28, 2023Certificate Index # 79
Date: November 07, 2022Certificate Index # 77
Date: October 14, 2022Certificate Index # 78
Date: October 14, 2022Certificate Index # 75
Date: September 06, 2022Certificate Index # 74
Date: September 06, 2022Certificate Index # 76
Date: October 07, 2022Certificate Index # 73
Date: September 02, 2022Certificate Index # 71
Date: September 02, 2022Certificate Index # 70
Date: August 31, 2022Certificate Index # 69
Date: August 10, 2022Certificate Index # 72
Date: September 02, 2022Certificate Index # 67
Date: August 10, 2022Certificate Index # 68
Date: August 10, 2022Certificate Index # 64
Date: August 08, 2022Certificate Index # 65
Date: August 09, 2022Certificate Index # 66
Date: August 10, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 63
Date: August 04, 2022Certificate Index # 62
Date: August 04, 2022Certificate Index # 61
Date: August 04, 2022Certificate Index # 60
Date: August 04, 2022Certificate Index # 59
Date: August 04, 2022Certificate Index # 57
Date: August 04, 2022Certificate Index # 56
Date: August 03, 2022Certificate Index # 58
Date: August 04, 2022Certificate Index # 55
Date: August 03, 2022Certificate Index # 54
Date: August 02, 2022Certificate Index # 52
Date: August 02, 2022Certificate Index # 48
Date: July 26, 2022Certificate Index # 50
Date: July 26, 2022Certificate Index # 51
Date: July 26, 2022Certificate Index # 49
Date: July 26, 2022Certificate Index # 53
Date: August 02, 2022Certificate Index # 45
Date: July 26, 2022Certificate Index # 47
Date: July 26, 2022Certificate Index # 46
Date: July 26, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 42
Date: July 15, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 41
Date: July 15, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 40
Date: July 15, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 38
Date: July 15, 2022Certificate Index # 35
Date: July 15, 2022Certificate Index # 34
Date: July 15, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 39
Date: July 15, 2022Certificate Index # 36
Date: July 15, 2022Certificate Index # 37
Date: July 15, 2022Certificate Index # 32
Date: July 15, 2022Certificate Index # 33
Date: July 15, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 44
Date: July 14, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 31
Date: July 14, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 43
Date: July 14, 2022Notice Index # 28
Date: June 22, 2022Amended Filing Index # 25
Date: June 14, 2022Notice Index # 23
Date: March 24, 2022Notice Index # 21
Date: December 14, 2021Notice Index # 30
Date: June 22, 2022Notice Index # 27
Date: June 22, 2022Notice Index # 26
Date: June 22, 2022Notice Index # 29
Date: June 22, 2022Notice Index # 22
Date: December 14, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 24
Date: June 14, 2022Notice Index # 19
Date: December 14, 2021Notice Index # 20
Date: December 14, 2021Notice Index # 17
Date: December 14, 2021Notice Index # 18
Date: December 14, 2021Notice Index # 16
Date: December 14, 2021Notice Index # 15
Date: December 14, 2021Notice Index # 14
Date: December 14, 2021Notice Index # 13
Date: December 14, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 9
Date: October 19, 2021Notice Index # 11
Date: October 29, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 12
Date: November 04, 2021Order Index # 10
Date: October 20, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 8
Date: October 15, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 7
Date: September 15, 2021Officers Return Index # 6
Date: September 07, 2021Officers Return Index # 5
Date: September 07, 2021Issuance Index # 4
Date: September 01, 2021Request Index # 2
Date: August 30, 2021Issuance Index # 3
Date: September 01, 2021Petition Index # 1
Date: August 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 88 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 88 |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 86 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 86 |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 85 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 85 |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 87 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 87 |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 84 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 84 |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment Final Judgment After Non-Jury Trial Index # 83 Final Judgment After Non-Jury Trial Index # 83Judgment |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery (158.00) Certificate Index # 82 Certificate Index # 82Notice of Delivery ($158.00) |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery ($146.55) Certificate Index # 81 Certificate Index # 81Notice of Delivery ($146.55) |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery ($160.75) Certificate Index # 80 Certificate Index # 80Notice of Delivery ($160.75) |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery ($157.45) Certificate Index # 79 Certificate Index # 79Notice of Delivery ($157.45) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.