Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Foster, Fage, Jr, Foster, Lisa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Robert C. Lane, against Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., represented by William Lance Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint involves a case where the defendants, JPMorgan Chase Bank and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, failed to cure defects in a void home equity loan that does not comply with the Texas Constitution. The plaintiffs, Fage Foster, Jr. ...
Other Dispositions Index # 8
Date: January 23, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 5
Date: December 02, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 7
Date: January 13, 2022Issuance Index # 3
Date: February 25, 2021Issuance Index # 4
Date: February 25, 2021Proposed Order Index # 6
Date: December 02, 2021Request Index # 2
Date: February 24, 2021Petition Index # 1
Date: February 24, 2021Request      Index # 2
Date: February 24, 2021Petition      Index # 1
Date: February 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Consent Judgment Other Dispositions Index # 8 Other Dispositions Index # 8Consent Judgment |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment Motion (No Fee) Index # 7 Motion (No Fee) Index # 7Stipulation and Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment Motion (No Fee) Index # 5 Motion (No Fee) Index # 5Stipulation and Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Consent Judgment Proposed Order Index # 6 Proposed Order Index # 6Consent Judgment |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation - JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation - Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation Issuance Index # 4 Issuance Index # 4Citation Issued to Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Citatione-ServiceFederal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation Unserved | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Citatione-ServiceJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Unserved | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Issuance Index # 3Citaiton Issued to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Issuance Index # 4Citaiton Issued to Federal Homs Loan Mortgage Corporation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.