Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mast, Dena, Mast, James, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Williamson, Michael, Williamson, Raquel, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Michael S. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 09, 2009 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Time To Trial94 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions150 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time150 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration 713310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 241110 - Agency DECLARATION [713310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By AGENCY [241110] |
|
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 714310-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per WRIT: ISSUED [714310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 714310-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per WRIT: ISSUED [714310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 713610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [713610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims) 714120-Judgment: Notice of Entry Filed/Issued By: JUDGMENT: NOTICE OF ENTRY [714120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Trial 711110-Hearing: Small Claims; Mast, J. et. al. vs. Williamson, M. et. al. ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Nov 6 2009 Type: 751110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 722110 - After Contested Hrg |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Trial 711110-Hearing: Small Claims; Mast, J. et. al. vs. Williamson, M. et. al. ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice 712910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk NOTICE [712910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request: Postponement (Small Claims) 721170-Request to Postpone Hearing Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per REQUEST TO POSTPONE HEARING [721170] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.