Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Aliana Homeowners Association, Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Edward Holtz, Kashun Winnie Cheung, against Alinsug, Sylvia M., in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 23
Date: August 28, 2023Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 22
Date: August 28, 2023Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 20
Date: August 28, 2023Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 19
Date: August 28, 2023Notice Index # 17
Date: June 21, 2023Agreed Judgment Index # 18
Date: August 28, 2023Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 21
Date: August 28, 2023Order Index # 13
Date: December 30, 2022Officers Return Index # 10
Date: March 08, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 12
Date: November 15, 2022Request Index # 8
Date: February 28, 2022Issuance Index # 9
Date: March 03, 2022Amended Filing Index # 7
Date: February 28, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 5
Date: January 26, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 6
Date: May 25, 2021Officers Return Index # 4
Date: January 13, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 14
Date: January 31, 2023Issuance Index # 3
Date: October 01, 2020Notice Index # 16
Date: January 31, 2023Request Index # 2
Date: October 01, 2020Proposed Order Index # 15
Date: January 31, 2023Petition Index # 1
Date: October 01, 2020DWOP Notice Sent
Date: October 31, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 11
Date: May 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 23 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 23 |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 22 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 22 |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 20 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 20 |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 19 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 19 |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment Index # 18 Agreed Judgment Index # 18Agreed Final Judgment |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 21 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 21 |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
M/Default Judgment CANCELED M/Default Judgment (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Glover, Tamecia) Passed |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Oral Hearing Notice Index # 17 Notice Index # 17Notice of Oral Hearing |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
M/Default Judgment CANCELED M/Default Judgment (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Glover, Tamecia) Passed |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Foreclosure Not Requested) Motion (No Fee) Index # 14 Motion (No Fee) Index # 14Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Foreclosure Not Requested) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.