Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mid-America Apartments, L.P., filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Patrick T Donovan, against Fort Bend Central Appraisal District, represented by Tyler Mccarty, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
|
This complaint is a legal document filed by Mid-America Apartments, L.P. (Village at Kirkwood Apartments) against the Fort Bend Central Appraisal District. The plaintiff is seeking both monetary relief of $100,000 or less in attorneys' fees and non-m...
Agreed Judgment Index # 6
Date: December 30, 2020Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 8
Date: December 30, 2020Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5
Date: September 10, 2020Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 7
Date: December 30, 2020Letters
Date: December 15, 2020Officers Return Index # 4
Date: August 27, 2020Issuance Index # 3
Date: August 25, 2020Request Index # 2
Date: August 24, 2020Petition Index # 1
Date: August 24, 2020Request      Index # 2
Date: August 24, 2020Petition      Index # 1
Date: August 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment Index # 6 Agreed Judgment Index # 6Agreed Final Judgment |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 8 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 8 |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 7 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 7 |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter LettersCover Letter |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Officers Return Index # 4 Officers Return Index # 4Citation Return for Fort Bend Central Appraisal District Served on 08-26-20 |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Officers Return Index # 4Citation Return for Fort Bend Central Appraisal District Served on 08-26-20 | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation FBCAD Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Fort Bend Central Appraisal District |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | CitationPCT 1Fort Bend Central Appraisal DistrictServed08/26/2020Returned08/27/2020 | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Fort Bend Central Appraisal District |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.