Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
First Colony Community Services Association, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Melissa Mclain, against Invync, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Donald W. Bankston presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2020 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by First Colony Community Services Association, Inc. against INVYNC, LLC in the District Court of Fort Bend County, Texas. The plaintiff is a non-profit corporation located in Fort Bend County, Texas, while the defendant is a ...
Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 9
Date: May 06, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 8
Date: April 27, 2021Proposed Order Index # 6
Date: January 20, 2021Notice Index # 7
Date: January 20, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 5
Date: January 20, 2021Officers Return Index # 4
Date: September 01, 2020Issuance Index # 3
Date: August 21, 2020Request Index # 2
Date: August 20, 2020Petition Index # 1
Date: August 20, 2020Request      Index # 2
Date: August 20, 2020Petition      Index # 1
Date: August 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Non-Suit Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 9 Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 9Order of Non-Suit |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit Motion (No Fee) Index # 8 Motion (No Fee) Index # 8Notice of Non-Suit |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
M/Default Judgment CANCELED M/Default Judgment (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bankston, Donald W) Passed |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Default Judgment Proposed Order Index # 6 Proposed Order Index # 6Final Default Judgment |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Oral Hearing Notice Index # 7 Notice Index # 7Notice of Oral Hearing |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Motion (No Fee) Index # 5 Motion (No Fee) Index # 5Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgmentt |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service - Citation for INVYNC, LLC Served 8/27/20 Officers Return Index # 4 Officers Return Index # 4Affidavit of Service - Citation for INVYNC, LLC Served 8/27/20 |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Officers Return Index # 4Affidavit of Service - Citation for INVYNC, LLC Served 8/27/20 | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation INVYNC, LLC Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to INVYNC, LLC |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | CitationeServiceINVYNC, LLCServed08/27/2020Returned09/01/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.