Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Reo Trust 2017-Rpl1, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ester Gonzales, against Jamie Michelle Funk, Mooney, Tommy R., Jr, Occupant Of Property, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Donald W. Bankston presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2020 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a tracking result from USPS.com. It appears to be a feedback document related to a USPS tracking number. The document includes two pages of feedback, but the content of the feedback is not provided in the text. Therefore, I am unabl...
Default Judgment Index # 13
Date: June 16, 2020Notice Index # 12
Date: May 15, 2020Certificate Index # 10
Date: April 08, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 9
Date: April 08, 2020Motion (No Fee) Index # 8
Date: April 08, 2020Issuance Index # 7
Date: February 27, 2020Issuance Index # 6
Date: February 27, 2020Issuance Index # 5
Date: February 27, 2020Issuance Index # 4
Date: February 27, 2020Issuance Index # 3
Date: February 27, 2020Issuance Index # 2
Date: February 27, 2020Petition Index # 1
Date: February 26, 2020Petition      Index # 1
Date: February 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Order Default Judgment Index # 13 Default Judgment Index # 13Default Order |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Default Judgment Index # 13Default Order | |
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | M/Default Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bankston, Donald W) | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice Index # 12 Notice Index # 12Notice of Hearing |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Index # 12Notice of Hearing | |
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address Certificate Index # 10 Certificate Index # 10Certificate of Last Known Address |
|
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Military Status Affidavit No Fee Documents Index # 9 No Fee Documents Index # 9Military Status Affidavit |
|
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Order Motion (No Fee) Index # 8 Motion (No Fee) Index # 8Motion for Default Order |
|
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate Index # 10Certificate of Last Known Address | |
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event | No Fee Documents Index # 9Military Status Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.