Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pelmore, Tanieka S., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Evette M Hooper, against Seale, Randolph Mcclean, represented by Daniel C Andrews, Eric Freemyer, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Argie D. Brame presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArgie D. Brame Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2018 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Exhibit
Date: July 06, 2023Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 136
Date: April 19, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 134
Date: April 19, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 135
Date: April 19, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 133
Date: April 19, 2022Final Judgment by Jury Verdict Index # 132
Date: April 19, 2022Charge of the Court Index # 131
Date: April 05, 2022Jury Index # 130
Date: April 05, 2022Jury Index # 121
Date: April 05, 2022Jury Index # 129
Date: April 05, 2022Jury Index # 120
Date: April 05, 2022Jury Index # 127
Date: March 31, 2022Jury Index # 126
Date: March 31, 2022Jury Index # 125
Date: March 31, 2022Jury Index # 124
Date: March 31, 2022Jury Index # 123
Date: March 31, 2022Jury Index # 122
Date: March 31, 2022Jury Selected Index # 119
Date: March 31, 2022Jury Index # 118
Date: March 31, 2022Order Index # 116
Date: March 31, 2022Order Index # 103
Date: March 31, 2022Order Index # 117
Date: March 30, 2022Amended Filing Index # 115
Date: March 15, 2022Order Index # 94
Date: March 11, 2022Proposed Order Index # 114
Date: March 10, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 113
Date: March 10, 2022Letters
Date: March 10, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 112
Date: March 10, 2022Amended Filing Index # 111
Date: March 10, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 110
Date: March 10, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 109
Date: March 10, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 108
Date: March 10, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 107
Date: March 10, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 106
Date: March 09, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 105
Date: March 09, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 104
Date: March 09, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 102
Date: March 09, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 101
Date: March 09, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 100
Date: March 09, 2022Proposed Order Index # 99
Date: March 09, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 98
Date: March 09, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 97
Date: March 09, 2022Proposed Order Index # 96
Date: March 09, 2022Notice Index # 95
Date: February 28, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 93
Date: February 28, 2022Notice Index # 92
Date: January 12, 2022Notice Index # 91
Date: January 06, 2022Notice Index # 90
Date: November 10, 2021Notice Index # 89
Date: October 26, 2021Certificate Index # 88
Date: September 02, 2021Order Index # 87
Date: July 15, 2021Certificate Index # 86
Date: June 25, 2021Notice Index # 85
Date: June 02, 2021Certificate Index # 84
Date: May 07, 2021Certificate Index # 83
Date: April 15, 2021Certificate Index # 82
Date: April 05, 2021Certificate Index # 81
Date: March 30, 2021Certificate Index # 80
Date: March 08, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 78
Date: February 25, 2021Order Index # 79
Date: March 01, 2021Notice Index # 77
Date: February 11, 2021Notice Index # 76
Date: January 20, 2021Notice Index # 70
Date: August 05, 2020Notice Index # 73
Date: December 29, 2020Issuance Index # 75
Date: January 04, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 72
Date: December 16, 2020Request Index # 74
Date: December 29, 2020Order Index # 71
Date: September 15, 2020Motion (No Fee) Index # 69
Date: August 03, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 68
Date: July 07, 2020Certificate Index # 67
Date: June 09, 2020Certificate Index # 65
Date: June 09, 2020Certificate Index # 66
Date: June 09, 2020Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 64
Date: March 30, 2020Order Index # 62
Date: February 25, 2020Motion (No Fee) Index # 61
Date: February 13, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 63
Date: February 13, 2020Certificate Index # 59
Date: January 27, 2020Certificate Index # 60
Date: January 27, 2020Certificate Index # 58
Date: December 30, 2019Certificate Index # 57
Date: December 18, 2019Certificate Index # 56
Date: December 18, 2019Certificate Index # 55
Date: December 18, 2019Certificate Index # 54
Date: December 18, 2019Certificate Index # 53
Date: December 18, 2019Certificate Index # 51
Date: November 19, 2019Certificate Index # 52
Date: December 09, 2019Certificate Index # 50
Date: November 19, 2019Certificate Index # 49
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 48
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 47
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 46
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 43
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 44
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 45
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 41
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 42
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 38
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 39
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 40
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 37
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 36
Date: November 11, 2019Certificate Index # 35
Date: November 05, 2019Certificate Index # 34
Date: November 05, 2019Certificate Index # 32
Date: November 05, 2019Certificate Index # 33
Date: November 05, 2019Certificate Index # 31
Date: November 05, 2019Certificate Index # 30
Date: November 05, 2019Certificate Index # 29
Date: November 05, 2019Certificate Index # 28
Date: October 31, 2019Certificate Index # 27
Date: October 28, 2019Certificate Index # 26
Date: October 28, 2019Certificate Index # 25
Date: October 28, 2019Certificate Index # 23
Date: October 03, 2019Notice Index # 24
Date: October 07, 2019Certificate Index # 22
Date: September 11, 2019Order Index # 20
Date: June 04, 2019Certificate Index # 21
Date: September 11, 2019Amended Filing Index # 19
Date: May 13, 2019Certificate Index # 17
Date: May 06, 2019Notice Index # 18
Date: May 09, 2019Certificate Index # 15
Date: May 06, 2019Certificate Index # 16
Date: May 06, 2019Certificate Index # 12
Date: May 06, 2019Certificate Index # 14
Date: May 06, 2019Certificate Index # 13
Date: May 06, 2019Certificate Index # 10
Date: April 09, 2019Certificate Index # 11
Date: May 06, 2019Certificate Index # 8
Date: April 09, 2019Certificate Index # 9
Date: April 09, 2019Notice Index # 6
Date: December 17, 2018Certificate Index # 7
Date: April 09, 2019Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5
Date: September 27, 2018Issuance Index # 3
Date: August 28, 2018Request Index # 2
Date: August 27, 2018Case Information Sheet
Date: August 27, 2018Petition Index # 1
Date: August 27, 2018Docket Sheet
Date: August 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ExhibitExhbit List for 03-31-2022; 4-1-2022 4-4-2022 | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 136 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 136 |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 134 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 134 |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 135 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 135 |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 133 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 133 |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Take Nothing Judgment Final Judgment by Jury Verdict Index # 132 Final Judgment by Jury Verdict Index # 132Final Take Nothing Judgment |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Charge of the Court Index # 131 Charge of the Court Index # 131Charge of the Court |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Index # 130 Jury Index # 130Jury Questions Filed |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
*X Form - Jury Excuse Jury Index # 121 Jury Index # 121Jury Excuse |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Index # 129 Jury Index # 129Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.