Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Daniel D. Stavinoha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel D. Stavinoha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other      Doc ID# 10
Date: October 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Officers Return Doc ID# 11Citation Issued to Desmond Marquise Tates. Issued 10/08/2018. 4 pages | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Doc ID# 10Notice of Nonsuit | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
AG Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Stavinoha, Daniel D)
Judge: Stavinoha, Daniel D |
|
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | CitationE-ServiceTates, Desmond MarquiseServed10/22/2018Returned10/29/2018 | |
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Issuance Doc ID# 9Citation Issued to Desmond Marquise Tates. E-Service. | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Doc ID# 8Order Setting Hearing 1 pages | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | LettersCover Letter | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Officers Return Doc ID# 7Citation Return for Desmond Marquise Tates. Issued on 04/10/18. | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
AG Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Stavinoha, Daniel D)
Judge: Stavinoha, Daniel D |
|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | CitationEserviceTates, Desmond Marquise Returned Unserved 05/11/2018Returned05/11/2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.