Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aldrich, Jason, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Christopher Walker, Kiernan Mcalpine, against Baker Street Town Square, Llc, represented by Jared G. Flynn, Kurt W Meaders, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Robert L. Rolnick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Officers Return Index # 36
Date: January 09, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 38
Date: July 17, 2023Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 39
Date: July 17, 2023Notice Index # 37
Date: May 05, 2023Certificate Index # 34
Date: March 03, 2022Order Index # 35
Date: October 06, 2022Certificate Index # 30
Date: November 18, 2021Certificate Index # 32
Date: November 22, 2021Certificate Index # 33
Date: November 22, 2021Certificate Index # 31
Date: November 22, 2021Proposed Order Index # 24
Date: September 08, 2021Certificate Index # 28
Date: November 18, 2021Notice Index # 29
Date: November 18, 2021Certificate Index # 26
Date: November 08, 2021Certificate Index # 27
Date: November 08, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 25
Date: October 18, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 18
Date: December 21, 2020Motion (No Fee) Index # 23
Date: September 08, 2021Notice Index # 22
Date: August 26, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 21
Date: June 08, 2021Notice Index # 20
Date: March 31, 2021Amended Filing Index # 19
Date: February 12, 2021Notice Index # 16
Date: July 01, 2020Proposed Order Index # 15
Date: June 23, 2020Notice Index # 17
Date: December 21, 2020Amended Filing Index # 13
Date: June 05, 2020Order Index # 11
Date: December 17, 2019Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6
Date: July 09, 2018Notice Index # 12
Date: April 02, 2020Motion (No Fee) Index # 10
Date: December 12, 2019Bankruptcy (Inactive Status) Index # 5
Date: July 09, 2018Notice Index # 8
Date: April 02, 2019No Fee Documents Index # 9
Date: July 18, 2019Officers Return Index # 4
Date: June 21, 2018Notice Index # 7
Date: November 07, 2018Petition Index # 1
Date: December 28, 2017Issuance Index # 3
Date: December 29, 2017Letters
Date: December 03, 2018Case Information Sheet
Date: December 28, 2017Docket Sheet
Date: December 28, 2017Order      Doc ID# 11
Date: December 17, 2019Motion (No Fee)Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 10
Date: December 12, 2019No Fee Documents      Doc ID# 9
Date: July 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Non- Suit with Prejudice as to Defendant Baker Street Town Square, LLC. Motion (No Fee) Index # 38 Motion (No Fee) Index # 38Plaintiff's Notice of Non- Suit with Prejudice as to Defendant Baker Street Town Square, LLC. |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Plaintiff's Nonsuit with Prejudice as to Defendant Baker Street Town Square, LLC Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 39 Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 39Order Granting Plaintiff's Nonsuit with Prejudice as to Defendant Baker Street Town Square, LLC |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Reinstated Case Classified Inactive | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridges, Chad) SettledJURY TRIAL |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Notice of Settlement Notice Index # 37 Notice Index # 37Defendant's Notice of Settlement |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Hearing CANCELED Pre-Trial Conference Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridges, Chad) CourtPRE-TRIAL |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Hearing CANCELED Pre-Trial Conference Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridges, Chad) Other |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service - Subpoena Not Issued by DC Officers Return Index # 36 Officers Return Index # 36Affidavit of Service - Subpoena Not Issued by DC Served |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Docket Control Order Order Index # 35 Order Index # 35Agreed Docket Control Order |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification Oral Deposition of Jason Aldrich (Reported Remotely) ($508.60) Certificate Index # 34 Certificate Index # 34Reporter's Certification Oral Deposition of Jason Aldrich (Reported Remotely) ($508.60) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.